ORPINGTON DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of Scouting is to contribute to the development of young people in achieving their physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potentials, as individuals, as responsible citizens & members of their local, national and international communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Bromley
- Kent
Governance
- 12 February 1964: Standard registration
- 28 November 2012: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 28 November 2012: Funds transferred to 303547 BROMLEY DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
- ORPINGTON BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.68k | £15.68k | £55.55k | £44.12k | £31.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.84k | £10.39k | £40.27k | £46.51k | £62.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 19 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 09 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 14 February 2012 | 14 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 02 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 02 December 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 04 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 12 January 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCES DATED 6TH OCTOBER 1937 AND 15TH SEPTEMBER 1950 AND LEASE DATED 29TH MAY 1959 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1935
Charitable objects
ORPINGTON BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
ORPINGTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window