CHESAPEAKE MILL HERITAGE CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance of a small heritage centre in historic Water Mill.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
Governance
- 28 April 1997: Standard registration
- 06 October 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CHESAPEAKE MILL (Working name)
- MEON VALLEY ENVIRONMENTAL AND HERITAGE VISTOR AND STUDY CENTRE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2004 | 30/11/2005 | 30/11/2006 | 31/10/2007 | 31/10/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2008 | 11 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2007 | 03 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 NOVEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14 APRIL 1997 AND 19 DECEMBER 2005 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION DATED 10 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC OF THE HISTORY, ARCHITECTURE AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE OF THE CHESAPEAKE MILL WICKHAM IN THE COUNTY OF HAMPSHIRE , TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC OF THE HISTORY AND RELEVANCE OF THE SHIP CHESAPEAKE AND ITS BATTLE WITH THE ROYAL NAVY FRIGATE SHANNON. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC OF THE HISTORY OF THE VILLAGE OF WICKHAM AND ITS PLACE AND HERITAGE IN THE MEON VALLEY.
Area of benefit
CHESAPEAKE MILL, BRIDGE STREET, WICKHAM, HANTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window