Financial history THE TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY (SOUTH WALES)

Charity Number: 1069536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £47.03k £65.41k £35.08k £44.76k £55.05k
Total expenditure £48.79k £45.92k £58.28k £49.25k £46.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £29.80k £2.00k N/A N/A