Financial history THE SUNRISE (SIDMOUTH) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1063278
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £427.70k £420.60k £919.38k £711.45k £627.10k
Total expenditure £274.11k £364.18k £358.55k £382.22k £391.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £840.09k £616.54k £512.57k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £79.19k £94.91k £114.53k
Income - Other N/A N/A £105 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £342.84k £367.34k £374.90k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £15.71k £14.88k £16.91k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £15.84k £19.34k £19.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £327.00k £348.00k £355.00k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £15.71k £14.88k £16.91k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0