Financial history THE BOUCHER TRUST

Charity number: 1080824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £24.36k £38.39k £35.01k £37.30k £44.73k
Total expenditure £9.68k £18.25k £15.40k £17.14k £29.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A