EAST AND CENTRAL AFRICA EDUCATION SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We collect books, computers, science and sports equipment for needy schools in Africa. In 2025 we will introduce exchange program to allow cross culture between UK and Africa schools. Also we will introduce social tourism to boost income to schools that we assist. Adults who would like to visit rural Africa to help schools will be encouraged to do so. To help with small repairs and renovations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Slough
- Wokingham
- Kenya
- Tanzania
- Uganda
Governance
- 20 March 1997: Standard registration
- ECAES - SUPPORT AFRICA (Working name)
- SUPPORT AFRICA (UK) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cheryl Singo | Trustee | 24 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fue Anderson | Trustee | 24 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
TUSSAJE SINGO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR MWAMBOGELA MWAMBOGELA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MBAKI MBAKI ONYANGO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KOSSI ANDREW SINGO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £360 | £360 | £360 | £360 | £360 | |
|
Total expenditure | £180 | £10 | £140 | £130 | £275 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 August 2024 | 196 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 MARCH 1997
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CAPABLE STUDENTS WHO WISH TO PROCEED WITH HIGHER EDUCATION BUT CANNOT FINANCE THEIR STUDIES IN VARIOUS FIELDS OF EDUCATION PARTICULARLY IN RARE OR DEMANDING PROFESSIONS BY SEEKING FUNDS AND SCHOLARSHIPS FROM VARIOUS ORGANISATIONS, GOVERNMENTS AND INDIVIDUALS. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY SEEKING EQUIPMENT, INSTRUMENTS, FURNITURE AND OTHER EDUCATION MATERIALS FOR SELECTED SCHOOLS AND EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS IN EAST AND CENTRAL AFRICAN COUNTRIES ("MEMBER COUNTRIES" - THE MEMBER COUNTIES ARE TANZANIA, UGANDA, KENYA, RWANDA, BURUNDI AND ZAIRE). 3) TO MAINTAIN, REPAIR, IMPROVE, BEAUTIFY, RENOVATE THE FABRIC OF SELECTED SCHOOLS WHICH ARE IN BAD CONDITION AND ESTABLISH EDUCATION CENTRES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY SEEKING DONORS AND SPONSORS WHO WILL PROVIDE FUNDING, EQUIPMENTS OR/AND MATERIALS.
Area of benefit
TANZANIA, UGANDA, KENYA, RWANDA, BURUNDI AND ZAIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 BEDE WALK
READING
RG2 7UE
- Phone:
- 07856010901
- Email:
- kossingo@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window