Accounts and annual returns SHAHJALAL MOSQUE AND ISLAMIC CENTRE SOUTHAMPTON

Charity number: 1070647
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 22 March 2025 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 22 March 2025 45 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 08 March 2024 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 08 March 2024 32 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 03 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 03 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 09 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 09 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 11 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 11 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window