SHAHJALAL MOSQUE AND ISLAMIC CENTRE SOUTHAMPTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The running of Islamic activities within the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Southampton City
Governance
- 22 July 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shamsul Islam | Chair | 05 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sirazul Islam | Trustee | 05 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Monir Tofadar | Trustee | 05 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Muhith Khan | Trustee | 05 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Noor Hasan Sirajee | Trustee | 05 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abdullah Roshid | Trustee | 05 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Nazmul Islam | Trustee | 05 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tuhin Ahmed | Trustee | 05 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jaker Chowdhury | Trustee | 05 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.35k | £60.29k | £58.70k | £61.78k | £62.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.69k | £31.60k | £43.49k | £50.13k | £50.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.26k | £4.86k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 22 March 2025 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 22 March 2025 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 NOVEMBER 1997. ARTICLES AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 12 DECEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION AND TO RELIEVE POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND STRESS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE IN SOUTHAMPTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
121 ST. MARYS ROAD
SOUTHAMPTON
SO14 0BL
- Phone:
- 02380332979
- Email:
- moliksr@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window