Financial history THE MEYRICK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1063953
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £46.84k £2.18k £32.21k £111.87k £67.75k
Total expenditure £42.22k £11.62k £21.58k £108.40k £88.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A