Financial history CAT ACTION TRUST

Charity Number: 1063947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £371.65k £226.25k £303.33k £366.30k £84.85k
Total expenditure £212.81k £214.93k £184.74k £198.39k £207.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £16.12k £2.82k N/A N/A