Accounts and annual returns ROMSEY ROUND TABLE NO 484

Charity number: 1061542
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 04 August 2008 186 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 07 May 2008 97 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 07 April 2008 432 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 26 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required