Financial history 23RD CROYDON (1ST SOUTH NORWOOD) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303582
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £17.69k £21.18k £14.42k £12.49k £23.97k
Total expenditure £19.70k £3.02k £8.16k £16.51k £16.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £13.10k N/A £170 N/A