Financial history INTERPLAY (INTEGRATED PLAY AND LEISURE)

Charity number: 1062152
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £249.47k £305.91k £295.79k £384.09k £325.33k
Total expenditure £276.98k £268.65k £272.57k £335.55k £346.32k
Income from government contracts N/A £59.79k £137.75k £115.99k £132.07k
Income from government grants £241.26k £183.22k £151.33k £116.14k £104.11k