VALEWAYS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Valeways volunteers maintain public rights of way in the Vale of Glamorgan and publish a varied year-round programme of graded walks intended to promote the mental and physical well-being of the community, On its website are self -guided circular walks linking towns and villages to the surrounding countryside and points of interest,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £325 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
51 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 23 April 1997: Standard registration
- VALEWAYS (Working name)
- VALEWAYS LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Stuart Weston | Chair | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael France | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Norma Clark | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Stockford | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Exley | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Angharad Hills | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Jeffrey Hawkins | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.00k | £19.93k | £22.32k | £7.28k | £6.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.23k | £5.46k | £22.34k | £9.00k | £7.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.16k | £250 | £5.20k | £649 | £325 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 25 JUN 2020 AMENDED ON 10 NOV 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF PUBLIC RIGHTS OF WAY OVER FOOTPATHS AND OTHER WAYS PARTICULARLY THOSE IN THE VALE OF GLAMORGAN THROUGH: - 1.1. A PROGRAMME OF WALKS LED BY TRAINED VOLUNTEERS, TO PROMOTE KNOWLEDGE OF THE VALE OF GLAMORGAN. 1.2. OFFERING OPPORTUNITIES FOR HEALTHY AND INCLUSIVE RECREATION THROUGH A RANGE OF GRADED WALKS, TO PROMOTE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING.
Area of benefit
VALE OF GLAMORGAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
COMMUNITY ENTERPRISE CENTRE
ENTERPRISE CENTRE
SKOMER ROAD
BARRY
CF62 9DA
- Phone:
- 01446749000
- Email:
- info@valeways.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window