OXFORD VINEYARD CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian faith including missionary activities in the United Kingdom and overseas. The relief of the poor, needy,sick and elderly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 04 September 1997: Standard registration
- VINEYARD CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP OF CHERWELL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW WILLIAM GILCHRIST MYATT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Aileen Curtis | Trustee | 15 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Durber | Trustee | 10 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.65k | £90.08k | £99.97k | £98.06k | £70.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.07k | £90.40k | £97.48k | £88.27k | £82.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.45k | £406 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 08 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 08 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION AMENDED ON 09 MAY 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO ATTACHED IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD THROUGH: • THE ORGANISATION AND PROVISION OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP; • THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACILITIES AND SERVICES AS ARE APPROPRIATE FOR THE CHURCH, TO ENABLE IT TO FULFIL ITS MISSION TO THE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH, VISITORS TO THE CHURCH AND THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY; • THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR CHRISTIAN TRAINING AND SERVICE; • THE SUPPORT AND PROVISION OF CHRISTIAN EVANGELISM AND OUTREACH; • THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TO THE WIDER CHRISTIAN CHURCH IN ITS MINISTRIES.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE OXFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stowford Farm
OXFORD
OX3 9RZ
- Phone:
- 01865522338
- Email:
- office@ovc.uk.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window