ELAN WALES

Charity number: 1064431
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Education/Training Arts/culture

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 September 1997: Standard registration
  • 09 December 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £78.69k £73.99k £74.70k £0 £0
Total expenditure £64.90k £80.61k £78.67k £24.94k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 08 April 2014 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 04 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 14 February 2012 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 13 December 2011 On Time