WINDSOR THEATRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides and support the operation of Theatre Royal Windsor for the purpose of advancing the education of the general public in performing arts, theatrical productions and artistic excellence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 19 July 1997: Standard registration
- THEATRE ROYAL WINDSOR (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Noble OBE | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Peregrine Anthony Guy Bousfield | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leo Townsend | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
LYDIA HARRATT | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|||||
PETER SPRATT | Trustee | 21 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
David Birdwood Archer | Trustee |
|
||||||
ELIZABETH ANTOINETTE COUNSELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.90k | £4.96k | £11.85k | £17.43k | £9.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.52k | £25.25k | £21.72k | £22.21k | £21.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 JANUARY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 2 JANUARY 1997 as amended on 16 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY PROMOTING THE PERFORMING ARTS, THEATRICAL PRODUCTIONS AND ARTISTIC EXCELLENCE AND PROVIDING AND OPERATING A THEATRE
Area of benefit
WINDSOR
Contact information
- Address:
-
90 GLASSMOOR BANK
WHITTLESEY
Whittlesey Peterborough
Whittlesey Peterborough
County
PE7 2LT
- Phone:
- 07926565900
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window