Trustees The Neath Port Talbot Community Voluntary Service Limited

Charity number: 1064450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr EDWARD MORGAN ROBERTS Chair 26 September 2013
None on record
Amanda Ellis Trustee 05 October 2023
None on record
SAIFUR RAHAMAN Trustee 06 October 2022
NEATH PORT TALBOT BLACK MINORITY ETHNIC COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: 42 days late
Hugh Newton James Trustee 02 December 2021
None on record
LORRAINE MILES Trustee 28 January 2021
NEATH PORT TALBOT SHOPMOBILITY SCHEME
Received: On time
Barbara Mary Cole Trustee 02 October 2014
None on record
Linda Adair Whittaker Trustee 02 October 2014
CARE AND REPAIR WESTERN BAY
Received: On time
LESLEY SMITH Trustee 23 October 2003
VIEW ( DOVE ) LTD
Received: On time