LIMELIGHTS - THE CLUB FOR YOUNG PEOPLE

Charity Number: 1067853
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote health issues To provide sport activities To provide group activities e.g Duke of Edinburgh Award To provide music facilities inc DJing

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £43,111
Total expenditure: £34,720

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset
  • Poole

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 January 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
COUNCILLOR SANDRA MOORE Trustee
None on record
GEORGE THOMAS STEVENS Trustee
None on record
TONY IVES Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £26.77k £20.79k £30.39k £39.46k £43.11k
Total expenditure £20.39k £15.81k £40.10k £33.99k £34.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.50k £9.50k £9.50k £9.50k £9.50k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 26 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2025 361 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 January 2025 361 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
119 Brampton Road
POOLE
Dorset
BH15 3RF
Phone:
01202624089
Website:

No information available