Trustees 18TH PURLEY SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 303608

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RODNEY NEWMAN | Chair | 12 March 2000 |
|
|
||||
Alexia De Lecaros Hemmons | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Wyatt | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Gadsby | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Hall | Trustee | 24 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Griffin | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Hill | Trustee | 14 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN MITCHELL | Trustee | 10 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA HILL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.