ST JOHN'S SCHOOL PTA (CLIFTON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PTA builds the school community, supports the school, provides a voice for parents and raises funds for St John's School, Clifton. Funds are raised via (1) Events such as Christmas and May Fairs (2) Gift aid giving and (3) Local business support, and are used for eg, new playground and ICT equipment and refurbishment of the school library.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bristol City
Governance
- 16 December 1997: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Stagg | Chair | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Tonks | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Abigail Lake | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
JUSTIN ROBERT HOYE | Trustee | 27 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANTONY WEIR | Trustee | 27 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.17k | £21.63k | £26.79k | £36.22k | £33.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.81k | £12.74k | £11.85k | £14.28k | £99.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 October 2023 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 11 October 2023 | 103 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 April 2023 | 298 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 April 2023 | 298 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 July 2022 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 November 2020 | 152 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 November 2020 | 152 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 1ST OCTOBER 1997 as amended on 22 Oct 2020 as amended on 22 Oct 2020 as amended on 18 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
2. PURPOSES The object of the association (the objects) is to advance the education of pupils in the school in particular by: 2.1 Developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school 2.2 Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. JOHNS C OF E VC PRIMARY SCHOOL
WORRALL ROAD
BRISTOL
BS8 2UH
- Phone:
- 0117 9030251
- Email:
- pta@stjohnsprimary.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window