Financial history AMBERLEY PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1064173
Charity reporting is up to date (74 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £72.41k £70.51k £65.46k £75.48k £73.58k
Total expenditure £69.50k £61.42k £59.55k £65.54k £74.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £37.45k N/A £49.56k £51.69k £67.29k