Trustees THE VIKINGS
Charity Number: 1062495

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Minette Murphy | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Richard Wolsey | Trustee | 15 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Chelsea Amber Carr | Trustee | 15 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Marie Elizabeth Houghton | Trustee | 15 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Evelyn Paul Bushell | Trustee | 28 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Allan Ishmael Gendall | Trustee | 29 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maiken Lykke Bagley | Trustee | 29 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Tate | Trustee | 29 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Evans | Trustee | 21 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Michael Finch | Trustee | 11 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE LINES | Trustee | 05 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA ELIZABETH ORCHARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEVEN LINES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT CLEGG | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.