Financial history WHITELEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1062300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £77.94k £68.15k £71.98k £84.36k £94.14k
Total expenditure £68.03k £69.39k £98.60k £103.27k £87.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £14.23k £25.13k £6.08k £600 N/A