THE CARDIFF TRANSPORT PRESERVATION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The CTPG lease the old Western Welsh depot on Broad Street, Barry from the Vale of Glamorgan Council. The CTPG organises several open days and vehicle rallies each year and holds a monthly meeting on the third wednesday of each month. Members receive a quarterly newsletter and if they wish help to restore the Groups buses, ride on them and drive them to rallies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 01 July 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIKE TAYLOR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rhys Michael JAMES | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carl Stuart WREN | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martyn EVANS | Trustee | 21 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Richard David JOHNSON | Trustee | 19 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.60k | £68.83k | £101.36k | £83.43k | £76.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.62k | £40.98k | £51.81k | £108.55k | £87.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 November 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 November 2024 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 JANUARY 1997 AS AMENDED 16 MAY 1997. AS AMENDED 20 SEPTEMBER 2006. as amended on 23 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY INCREASING KNOWLEDGE AND INTEREST IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE TRANSPORT HERITAGE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
CITY OF CARDIFF AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Warren Drive
Caerphilly
CF83 1HQ
- Phone:
- 07733302242
- Email:
- info@ctpg.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window