Financial history EALING AND HANWELL DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 303622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £110.94k £76.95k £85.60k £114.07k £143.96k
Total expenditure £96.83k £48.20k £70.25k £76.77k £140.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £30.24k £8.57k N/A N/A