Accounts and annual returns CHELTENHAM CRIME PREVENTION PANEL

Charity Number: 1061435
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 04 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 28 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required