Accounts and annual returns KIDDERMINSTER FESTIVAL OF DANCE

Charity Number: 1062294
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2009 31 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2008 27 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not Required