Financial history 8TH EALING SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303625
Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £29.06k £33.44k £35.52k £38.64k £37.05k
Total expenditure £10.81k £13.52k £16.08k £12.98k £22.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £20.19k £12.77k N/A