Financial history DORCHESTER AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1066401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £82.73k £138.10k £606.97k £784.79k £765.77k
Total expenditure £172.48k £141.86k £711.73k £799.37k £922.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £30.61k £886 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £18.43k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £568.65k £730.99k £682.77k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £7.71k £10.92k £14.43k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £42.00k £50.15k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £707.05k £795.08k £918.19k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £4.68k £4.30k £4.40k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £69.84k £82.02k £74.66k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £4.43k £500 £4.28k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £4.68k £4.30k £4.40k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0