Trustees DORCHESTER AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1066401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Hyde Trustee 30 April 2025
None on record
Rebecca HIll Trustee 30 April 2025
None on record
James Cossins Trustee 20 May 2024
TARRANT KEYNESTON RECREATION GROUND AND VILLAGE HALL TRUST
Received: On time
Karen Van Dijk Trustee 24 November 2023
None on record
Paul Dunlop Trustee 01 February 2021
None on record
Benjamin Best Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Neil Martin Trustee 01 November 2016
None on record
Jason Bowerman Trustee 20 April 2016
None on record