COMMUNITY ACTION ISLE OF WIGHT

Charity Number: 1063737
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote and organise co-operation in the achievement of any charitable purposes for the benefit of the community in the County of the Isle of Wight in furtherance of health and conservation or protection of the environment in a manner recognised as charitable and for the relief of poverty, distress, disability and sickness.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Isle Of Wight

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 July 1997: Standard registration
  • 11 February 2016: Funds received from 1010432 THE RIVERSIDE CENTRE LIMITED
  • 12 July 2023: Funds received from 1187550 ISLE OF WIGHT SHOPMOBILITY
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ISLE OF WIGHT RURAL COMMUNITY COUNCIL (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
EMMA CORINA Chair
None on record
Debra Mary Andre Trustee 26 June 2024
None on record
Keith Sheldrake Trustee 31 January 2024
None on record
Mark Anthony Meredith Trustee 31 January 2024
None on record
Michael Lilley Trustee 30 March 2023
None on record
Claire Jean Robertson Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Andrea Mary Smith Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Raymond John Harrington-Vail Trustee 11 February 2014
None on record
Dr BRIAN JOHN COLES HINTON MBE Trustee
THE JULIA MARGARET CAMERON TRUST
Received: On time
Richard Priest Trustee
THE SHANKLIN CHINE TRUST
Received: 46 days late
MR PADDY NOCTOR FRSA Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.69m £1.52m £1.67m £2.00m £1.68m
Total expenditure £1.90m £1.58m £1.72m £1.81m £1.74m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £78.00k £50.00k
Income from government grants £228.26k £246.52k £212.82k £308.34k £240.73k
Income - Donations and legacies £6.50k £3.35k £1.12k £17.44k £5.61k
Income - Other trading activities £1.20m £921.59k £1.06m £1.16m £1.01m
Income - Charitable activities £481.82k £593.38k £593.48k £816.93k £650.92k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.68k £1.76k £1.66k £3.55k £10.29k
Income - Other £5.98k £1.94k £17.62k £2.33k £3.75k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £711.19k £685.04k £646.79k £890.32k £816.54k
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.19m £895.27k £1.07m £921.19k £927.81k
Expenditure - Governance £6.65k £0 £8.64k £9.48k £9.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £91.71k £62.58k £17.98k £40.92k £18.55k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £100.48k £57.06k £59.05k £71.44k £24.47k
Long-term investments £0 £10.00k £10.00k £10.01k £10.10k
Other assets £834.18k £766.60k £739.59k £868.43k £804.70k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £152.76k £110.04k £133.76k £81.99k £33.49k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 18 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 February 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 February 2021 10 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE RIVERSIDE CENTRE
THE QUAY
NEWPORT
PO30 2QR
Phone:
01983524058