THE C P CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Funds medical research in the UK and abroad into children's illnesses, supports charities and voluntary bodies in the UK and abroad supporting children, and supports the environment, conservation and heritage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Camden
- Newham
- Surrey
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Kenya
- Nepal
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- The Gambia
- Uganda
- Ukraine
Governance
- 24 March 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR CHRISTOPHER BREWER | Chair | 07 February 1997 |
|
|
||||
Helen Brewer | Trustee | 25 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
SAMANTHA BREWER | Trustee | 25 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES THOMAS BREWER | Trustee | 26 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR S R BREWER | Trustee | 26 April 2013 |
|
|||||
MRS P M BREWER | Trustee | 07 February 1997 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/10/2019 | 01/10/2020 | 01/10/2021 | 01/10/2022 | 01/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.02k | £150.02k | £125.00k | £125.02k | £150.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £301.16k | £476.63k | £306.79k | £478.72k | £362.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2022 | 27 November 2023 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2022 | 27 November 2023 | 118 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2021 | 28 October 2022 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2021 | 28 October 2022 | 88 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2020 | 04 December 2021 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2020 | 04 December 2021 | 125 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 109 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 FEBRUARY 1997
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF MEDICAL RESEARCH PROJECTS GENERALLY. (SEE GI FOR FULL DETAILS)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Albany House (c/o SRB)
Ashford Road
Eastbourne
East Sussex
BN21 3TR
- Phone:
- 01323411080
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window