THE INTERNATIONAL FOUNDATION FOR ARTS AND CULTURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of the following ares: Education/Training Arts/culture/heritage/science Focussing on various projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 October 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brendan Scannell | Trustee | 19 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Nilesh Chimanbhai Patel | Trustee | 19 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
MR TIM LANKESTER | Trustee | 20 October 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.50k | £317.63k | £413.16k | £432.26k | £222.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £129.50k | £304.74k | £395.25k | £435.28k | £204.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 December 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 December 2021 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 DECEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED 22 OCTOBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 15 SEPTEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL FORMS OF THE ARTS AND CULTURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Vine House
41 Portsmouth Road
COBHAM
Surrey
KT11 1JQ
- Phone:
- 01932589070
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window