TRADE PLUS AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Trade plus Aid donates funds to projects designed to alleviate poverty in some of the world's poorest communities, to assist disadvantaged communities to become self-sufficient and to protect the environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambodia
- India
- Kenya
- Mozambique
- South Africa
- United Arab Emirates
Governance
- 19 March 1997: Standard registration
- TRADE PLUS AID CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Oliver Redford-Jones | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|||||
DR Marcelo de Andrade | Trustee | 05 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
NICOLE MARIE HIRST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.13k | £52.96k | £560 | £250 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.13k | £52.96k | £10.80k | £250 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 383 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 383 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 FEBRUARY 1997 AS AMENDED BY DEED 20 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE RECOGNISED AS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ENGLISH LAW, IN SUCH MANNER OR IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
1548 DAVENPORT HOUSE
261 Bolton Road
BURY
BL8 2NZ
- Phone:
- 0203 129 5036
- Email:
- trustees@tradeplusaid.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window