Financial history LAWCARE LIMITED

Charity number: 1061685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £311.64k £324.78k £410.32k £471.10k £379.63k
Total expenditure £355.87k £362.37k £359.72k £458.88k £428.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A