Governing document LAWCARE LIMITED

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 FEBRUARY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30 SEPTEMBER 1997, 6 AUGUST 2001 AND 20 SEPTEMBER 2007. as amended on 05 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED (THE "OBJECTS") ARE: A. THE RELIEF OF MENTAL AND PHYSICAL ILLNESS RESULTING FROM ALCOHOL OR DRUG ADDICTION OR FROM OTHER FORMS OF DEPENDENCE ASSOCIATED WITH COMPULSIVE BEHAVIOUR OR WITH STRESS OR DEPRESSION IN PARTICULAR AMONG MEMBERS OF THE LEGAL PROFESSION AND THOSE CONNECTED WITH IT; B. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND, IN PARTICULAR MEMBERS OF THE LEGAL PROFESSION AND THOSE CONNECTED WITH IT, IN THE CAUSES AND CONSEQUENCES OF ALCOHOL AND DRUG ADDICTION, OTHER FORMS OF DEPENDENCE, COMPULSIVE BEHAVIOUR OR WITH STRESS OR DEPRESSION AND IN THE MEANS OF MANAGING STRESS AND DEPRESSION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.