Trustees LAWCARE LIMITED
Charity number: 1061685

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karl Ernest Cerski | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Williams | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Edie O'Connor | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucinda Soon | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Heather McKendrick | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Helen Joseph | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Paul Harper Nevin | Trustee | 22 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Louise Marks | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CAPLEN | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Guerin | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.