THE STANDARD STEAM LOCOMOTIVE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CONSTRUCTION AND OPERATION OF A STEAM LOCOMOTIVE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 May 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Trevor England | Chair | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Spenceley | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter George Lawne | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Michael Hind | Trustee | 14 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Henderson | Trustee | 14 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bob Ife | Trustee | 15 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Chris Jones | Trustee | 15 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
GEOFF TURNER | Trustee | 16 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.69k | £82.20k | £82.40k | £65.91k | £79.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.47k | £99.07k | £62.62k | £69.26k | £20.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 APRIL 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 SEP 2019 as amended on 09 Oct 2021 as amended on 19 Nov 2022 as amended on 14 Oct 2023 as amended on 12 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
TO CONSTRUCT OPERATE AND EXHIBIT FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR EDUCATIONAL AND INSTRUCTIONAL PURPOSES LOCOMOTIVES OF HISTORIC OR SCIENTIFIC IMPORTANCE: FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
97 PINGLE ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S7 2LN
- Phone:
- 07970 639858
- Email:
- info@72010-hengist.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.