GL3 COMMUNITY HUB LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community development in the area of Churchdown,Innsworth and the wider area of the GL3 post code in Gloucestershire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 26 January 1998: Standard registration
- CCP (Working name)
- CHURCHDOWN PROJECT (Working name)
- CICP (Working name)
- CHURCHDOWN COMMUNITY PROJECT (Previous name)
- CHURCHDOWN COMMUNITY PROJECT LIMITED (Previous name)
- CHURCHDOWN NEIGHBOURHOOD PARTNERSHIP LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS PAT AUSTIN | Chair | 07 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Vizard | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Cox | Trustee | 26 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Holder | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Antill | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Lawson | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tina Lewis | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.76k | £67.20k | £115.77k | £97.81k | £184.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.74k | £85.20k | £103.04k | £97.19k | £203.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.43k | £36.90k | £34.44k | £10.57k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 JAN 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 NOV 2001 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19 APR 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 AUG 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS INCLUDING THE ELDERLY AND DISABLED.
Area of benefit
THE BENEFIT AREA SHALL BE THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA KNOWN AS THE PARISH OF CHURCHDOWN AND THE ADJOINING PARISH OF INNSWORTH IN THE BOROUGH OF TEWKESBURY, GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHELTENHAM ROAD EAST
CHURCHDOWN
GLOUCESTER
GL3 1HX
- Phone:
- 01452715058
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window