Financial history PEMBROKE COLLEGE OXFORD JCR ART COLLECTION FUND

Charity number: 1061991
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £15.77k £10.46k £9.92k £11.02k £21.02k
Total expenditure £9.25k £9.20k £18.64k £9.10k £19.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A