THE ALBANIA APPEAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing assistance and aid to needy people in Albania and for Albanian. This has taken the form of sending Medicine, food, hospital equipment and clothing, school equipments and placing workers in the field.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Albania
Governance
- 29 May 1997: Standard registration
- 20 November 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2013 | 01/09/2014 | 01/09/2015 | 01/09/2016 | 01/09/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £600 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2017 | 16 November 2018 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2016 | 28 April 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2015 | 14 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH JANUARY 1997
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND RELIEVE HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF THOSE IN NEED IN ALBANIA, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF HUMANITARIAN AID AND CHRISTIAN AID WORKERS
Area of benefit
ALBANIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window