YOUTH RESOURCE SERVICES (THE RENDEZVOUS SHERBORNE)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a charity based in Sherborne for Young People between the ages of 14 and 25, offering free, unbiased advice, information, support and guidance on a wide range of issues that may affect their lives. In addition we provide training and education, both formal and informal to all members of the comunity. We are an accessible drop-in Centre. We turn no one away.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Total income includes £13,778 from government contract(s) and £35,820 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 19 August 1997: Standard registration
- 08 November 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 08 November 2016: Funds transferred to 1162722 YOUTH RESOURCE SERVICES (THE RENDEZVOUS SHERBORNE)...
- 12 April 2022: Funds received from 1051687 LONG STRATTON DAY CENTRE
- 15 July 2022: Funds received from 1158659 HANDCROSS COMMUNITY PRESCHOOL
- THE RENDEZVOUS (Working name)
- SHERBORNE YOUTH RESOURCE CENTRE (Previous name)
- SHERBOURNE YOUTH RESOURCE CENTRE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.42k | £150.47k | £100.71k | £124.09k | £178.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.19k | £107.24k | £95.91k | £127.10k | £167.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £13.78k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £35.82k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 09 November 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 09 November 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 28 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 28 January 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 30 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 30 December 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 APRIL 1997 AS AMENDED 22 APRIL 1997, 28 SEPTEMBER 2000 AND 13 MARCH 2003, 29 APRIL 2004 AND 7 OCTOBER 2010.
Charitable objects
1) TO HELP AND EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE SHERBORNE AREA THROUGH THEIR LEISURE ACTIVITIES AND THROUGH ADVICE, GUIDANCE, INFORMATION, EDUCATION AND FORMAL AND INFORMAL TRAINING 2) THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A MEETING PLACE AND YOUTH ADVICE CENTRE (THE RENDEZVOUS) WHERE YOUNG PEOPLE CAN MEET IN A SAFE AND RELAXED ATMOSPHERE
Area of benefit
SHERBORNE AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window