24TH EDMONTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide fun & adventure conforming to the Scout Association policies & rules.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £30,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Enfield
Governance
- 13 May 1964: Standard registration
- 03 October 2013: Funds received from 267756 4TH EDMONTON SCOUT GROUP
- 2ND EDMONTON SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
- 2ND EDMONTON BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DIANE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 31 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALLAN HENRY BEAUMONT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.04k | £32.60k | £32.45k | £26.11k | £49.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.27k | £37.95k | £32.21k | £20.68k | £29.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £30.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 837 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 837 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24/10/1960 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 24/02/1976 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09/09/2013
Charitable objects
2ND EDMONTON BOY SCOUT GROUP.
Area of benefit
EDMONTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 WHEATLEY GARDENS
LONDON
N9 9UE
- Phone:
- 0208 807 1064
- Email:
- DIANE.WILLIAMS1@HOTMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window