ENFIELD DISTRICT SCOUTS COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE DISTRICT IS PART OF THE GREATER LONDON NORTH SCOUT COUNTY WHICH PROVIDES SCOUTING TO YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE LONDON BOROUGHS NORTH OF THE RIVER THAMES. THE DISTRICT SEEKS TO PROVIDE ADVICE AND SUPPORT FOR THE SCOUT GROUPS AND THE EXPLORER SCOUT SECTION THAT MAKE UP THE DISTRICT OF ENFIELD.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Enfield
Governance
- 13 February 1964: Standard registration
- ENFIELD BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew William Lightfoot | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Andrew Donn | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
James Patrick Delaney | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Luke Kirkham | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Jake Demetrios Orros | Trustee | 15 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Pytches | Trustee | 03 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Michael Roy Thurston | Trustee | 01 June 2008 |
|
|
||||
PAUL DOCKLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.00k | £58.20k | £54.82k | £51.19k | £55.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.79k | £34.56k | £44.46k | £60.88k | £55.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 4 JANUARY 1912 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 28 MARCH 1949 18 FEBRUARY 1959 5 MAY 1967 AND 19 JULY 1991
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL INTELLECTUAL SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENSAND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
ENFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 Rendlesham Road
Enfield
EN2 0TX
- Phone:
- 07505914341
- Email:
- chair@enfieldscouts.org.uk
- Website:
-
gln-scouts.org.uk/enfield
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window