SOUTHGATE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting activities for the Southgate district
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
250 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Enfield
Governance
- 09 April 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kieran James Costello | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Clare Louise Henderson | Trustee | 13 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Monica Sharma | Trustee | 13 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Steve Smith | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROGER LEWIS GARDNER | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANN LINDA MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HEDLEY JAMES WARNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH DOROTHEA BRANDI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £183.46k | £126.08k | £130.75k | £162.64k | £184.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £211.48k | £119.07k | £63.58k | £113.67k | £145.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £36.40k | £27.74k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 February 2025 | 376 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 February 2025 | 376 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 March 2023 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 March 2023 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 June 2021 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 June 2021 | 126 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION
Charitable objects
SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
SOUTHGATE
Contact information
- Address:
-
188 CHASE SIDE
LONDON
N14 5HN
- Phone:
- 02088820991
- Email:
- southgate@gln-scouts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window