Financial history 14TH HACKNEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303667
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2009 04/04/2010 04/04/2011 04/04/2012 04/04/2013
Total gross income £8.23k £9.45k £8.89k £9.37k £8.77k
Total expenditure £4.19k £8.45k £6.13k £8.43k £6.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A