Financial history 6TH SQUIRRELS HEATH SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 303707
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.64k £7.83k £15.03k £18.98k £24.14k
Total expenditure £12.96k £11.36k £13.69k £18.26k £19.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A