6TH EASTCOTE SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scout Group (Youth Activities)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 17 April 1964: Standard registration
- 6TH EASTCOTE BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Fisher | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Anne Lofty | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sian Kayleigh Kirkbride | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Slaney | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Linda Evans | Trustee | 14 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROY LANNING | Trustee | 12 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.01k | £16.32k | £25.50k | £18.44k | £21.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.95k | £4.64k | £14.57k | £19.01k | £15.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.86k | £14.37k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 February 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04/01/1912
Charitable objects
6TH EASTCOTE BOY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
EASTCOTE AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Thellusson Way
Rickmansworth
WD3 8RB
- Phone:
- 01923 466563
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window