Trustees 1st Malden Scout Group
Charity number: 303757

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Holly Walters | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Giles | Trustee | 28 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
SIEW PENG LIM | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
nicola jane jordan | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul James Teasdel | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Havelock | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Genevieve Truscott | Trustee | 07 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Shrimpton | Trustee | 07 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Pringle | Trustee | 01 August 2009 |
|
|
||||
Robert Ferguson Pringle | Trustee | 16 May 2005 |
|
|
||||
David Johnson | Trustee | 01 June 1999 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE WILKINSON | Trustee | 01 January 1980 |
|
|
||||
The Scout Association Trust Corporation Ltd | Trustee | 01 April 1950 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.